Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Analla, Jane C., Bencomo, Victor, Cha, Shelly, Griswold, Lorene, Griswold, Shawn, (total of 15) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Edwards, Lucas A, against Centex Homes, Centex Real Estate Corp, Cvc Construction Corp., M&L Plumbing Co., Inc, represented by Daniele, Ivo G, Doran, James W., Hammons, Wallace W, Li, Alice S., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2016 |
Category10 Unlimited - Construction Defect |
Time To Trial1235 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1431 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time370 days |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 12, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2016Amendment filed
Date: October 19, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 03, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 26, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 22, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: October 19, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 13, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: March 13, 2017Notice or Order Staying Action
Date: March 22, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 15, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: June 08, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 11, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 26, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 17, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: March 28, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 06, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 20, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: June 18, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 20, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 04, 2018Statement filed
Date: June 18, 2018Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 22, 2018Letter Received
Date: May 02, 2019Notice Filed
Date: May 02, 2019Order filed
Date: March 22, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 03, 2019Application Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 06, 2019Application Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 06, 2019Order filed
Date: May 09, 2019Order filed
Date: May 09, 2019Order filed
Date: May 08, 2019Objection filed
Date: June 06, 2019Cross Complaint Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Amendment filed
Date: May 04, 2020Order - Good Faith Settlement
Date: May 12, 2020Objection filed
Date: November 02, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: March 05, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 11, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Order - Good Faith Settlement
Date: April 07, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 15, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: March 05, 2021Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: April 07, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 05, 2021Cross Complaint Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 03, 2016Summons issued and filed
Date: June 06, 2016Association of Attorney filed
Date: September 29, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: June 06, 2016Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: October 14, 2016Proof of Service
Date: August 05, 2016Notice Filed
Date: September 27, 2016Amended Document Filed
Date: November 22, 2016Proof of Service
Date: November 22, 2016Summons issued and filed
Date: November 29, 2016Notice Filed
Date: December 21, 2016Notice Filed
Date: January 24, 2017Notice Filed
Date: February 07, 2018Notice Filed
Date: November 16, 2017Statement filed
Date: March 02, 2018Notice Filed
Date: March 05, 2018Notice Filed
Date: February 09, 2018Answer Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: February 19, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 18, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 26, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: April 24, 2019Application Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Notice Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Association of Attorney filed
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Proof of Service
Date: September 26, 2019Affidavit
Date: September 26, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: October 01, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 02, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Cross Complaint Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 02, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 10, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 18, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 13, 2019Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Answer Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 14, 2019Notice Filed
Date: January 14, 2020Answer Filed
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: June 04, 2020Answer Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Notice Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Application to Determine Good Faith Settlement
Date: March 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 23, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 16, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 07, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 25, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 08, 2021Objection filed
Date: December 11, 2020Objection filed
Date: November 02, 2020Notice Filed
Date: March 05, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Answer Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Answer Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Answer Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Answer Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Notice Filed
Date: July 07, 2020Objection filed
Date: June 17, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: May 04, 2020Application Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment With certificate of mailing |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Defendants Atty: Jacquiline McCalla, Benjamin West, Tina Schoneman |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment with certificate of mailing |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Defendants counsel: Brian Marrow, Benjamin West, James Doran, Tim McNeil |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
11/29/2022 Case Management Statement Case Management Statement Filed |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
11/29/2022 Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.