Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Torres, Alice D., Torres, Carlos, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gordon, Douglas L., against Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Padovich, Danny K., represented by Mullen, Robert B., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial579 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time595 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 12, 2017Ex parte Filed
Date: September 27, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: July 14, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 29, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 28, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 22, 2017Opposition filed
Date: August 09, 2017Reply filed
Date: August 09, 2017Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 16, 2017Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 23, 2017Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 29, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 15, 2016ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: August 04, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: April 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Plaintiff With an Estimated Time for Trial of 4-10 Days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on February 13, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305 |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date:December 13, 2017 |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Settled. |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing 225 Dismissal Hearing set for January 2, 2018 at 1:00 PM in RM. # 305 |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.