Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kane Cheung, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Auto Pennimen Market, Cross Country Motor Club Of California, Enterprise 24 Hour Auto, Pennimen Markit Group, Inc., Saiid Mohamed, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions395 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1130 days |
OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: September 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2017Hearing: Demurrer
Date: August 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2017Minute Order
Date: July 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 13, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 25, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: November 13, 2018Review: Case Status
Date: April 18, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 09, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 26, 2019OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: December 14, 2017Dismissal
Date: September 25, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: February 03, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: September 26, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 02, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Dismissal Cheung v. Enterprise 24 Hour Auto (16CV304702) |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Kane Cheung Case Managment Conference Statement |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 13 |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.