Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Christopher Rollins, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Johanna Carvajal, against Jaime Delgado Rodriguez, Victor Manuel Herrera-Salgado, represented by Charles R. Roe, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited (35) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions979 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time979 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 02, 2019Order
Date: October 24, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 22, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 04, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: May 30, 2018Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2017Application
Date: March 20, 2018OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: June 07, 2018OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: March 08, 2018OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: January 11, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 04, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: April 02, 2019OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: September 21, 2017Judgment
Date: September 03, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 20, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Offer to Compromise | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 19 |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 jury fees paid by Atty. Roe |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demand: Jury Trial Demand for Jury Trial |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order It is Ordered that the Summons be served by Publication in the San Jose Mercury News Paper once a week for Four consecutive weeks and a copy of Summons and Complaint by mailed to Def Rodriguez if their address is ascertained before expiration of the time herein prescribed for publication of summons by Judge Kirwan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.