Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
John Burgren, Juan M Simon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Kathleen Saucedo Dupre, represented by Paul Becker O'Keefe, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Helen E. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time768 days |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2017Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status
Date: April 05, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: February 04, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: February 04, 2019Stipulation and Order: ADR
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 20, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: January 15, 2019OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: September 21, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 03, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: November 21, 2017Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status
Date: June 28, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2018Notice: Settlement
Date: October 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal HRG: 2/7/2019 CSJ's Request for Dismissal of Cross-Complaint |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Complaint ONLY |
|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: ADR Granting Plt's ADR Stip & Vacated 10/18/18 hrg and set Meditation hearing on 12/20/18 @10:30am in D-13 by Judge Stoelker Judge: Helen E. Williams |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status
Judge: Department 13 |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 6/28/18 CMC atty O'Keefe |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic served CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.