Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
United Financial Casualty Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark R. Nivinskus, against Jessica D. Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore C. Zayner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Limited (22) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: December 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 29, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 19, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 19, 2017Review: Case Status
Date: March 29, 2018Review: Case Status
Date: December 20, 2018Dismissal
Date: March 06, 2018Dismissal
Date: April 30, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate: Facts-Unsatisfied Judgment DL-30 via Onetouch for Nivinskus law, cust. file# 15002067 |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment: Issued | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default $5,879.48, signed by Judge Kulkarni (mailed 03/09/19) |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 6 |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Does 1 - 20 ONLY |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 And evidence code 1550 |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Judgment was entered on 3/08/2019. |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.