Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Kovalerchik Revocable Trust Dated 02 02 2006, Vadim Kovalerchilk, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Arnak Azaryan, against Clear Recon Corp, Select Portfolio Servicing, represented by Genail M Anderson, Joseph Andrew Aguilar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference atty Straus |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of non monetary status |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Answer to complt. Atty Aguilar. |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.