Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kelstin Group, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Duree, Terry A, against Ray, Andshea Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management116 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Small Claims Jurisdiction |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions184 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time184 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 26, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: April 03, 2017Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: April 05, 2017Complaint
Date: December 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference continued from 6/9/17 for status of default Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment By Court
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part Does 1 to 5 With Prejudice |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of J Cullum |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default-Entered Andshea Michelle Ray |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.