Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Eleonor Hilario, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Jonathan Brand, against Jerry Aaron Jenkins, Genevie Jenkins, Does 1 To 10, represented by Timothy P Mcdonald, Reisinger, Robert L, Esq, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Civil Unlimited.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseCivil Unlimited |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2018 | Hearing |
Jury Trial Time estimate- 7 days Judge: - Master Calendar |
|
November 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: John L. Grandsaert |
|
November 05, 2018 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS
Judge: - Master Calendar |
|
October 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: John L. Grandsaert |
|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Judge: Susan Greenberg |
|
October 02, 2018 | Action |
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept #3 STRIKING PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ELEONOR HILARIO. |
|
October 02, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Stipulation TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
September 24, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept 3 - JUDGE GREENBERG |
|
August 15, 2018 | Document_Filed |
Order Type: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL Signed by: JUDGE FOILES Date Signed: 08/13/18 COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion to Continue Trial Date
Judge: Robert D Foiles |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.