Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Buie, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Van Egmond, Colleen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2010 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.