Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Woods, Douglas William, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2010 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.