Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Moreno, Jessica Ann, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJune 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
May 22, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
May 22, 2010 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.