Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sierra Central Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Waggoman & Smith, against Booth, Scott J, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Benson, Stephen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Stephen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management112 days |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR; DISM FILED Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & Desc2: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 5/6/16 Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: PBP Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [P] SIERRA CENTRAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMM/COMP/ETC AS TO SCOTT J BOOTH Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP | |
August 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: BOOTH, SCOTT J PartyId: 164644_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2015-08-16 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
August 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.