Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gilbert, Kurt Matthew, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Beaudry, Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2015 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING EXPIRES 04/13/18 12MIDNIGHT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AMI |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Desc: [P'S] OSC: HARASSMENT / TRO Desc2: TEMPS GRANTED FILED 03/20/2015 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED 3 YR R/O Disp Clerk: AMI Filing Clerk: KLN Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF COURT HEARING & TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AMI | |
April 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Personal | |
April 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: BEAUDRY, KELLY PartyId: 163786_2_210_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2015-04-04 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER (NON DV) TEMPS GRANTED ** PP HD ** HON. KRISTEN A LUCENA; JUDGE (C15) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF: COURT HEARING ON CH-TRO TEMPS GRANTED ** PP HD ** HON. KRISTEN A LUCENA; JUDGE (C15) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PETITION TO PREVENT CIVIL HARASSMENT INVOLVING VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.