Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lout, Carl Ray G W, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Clear Case From DMV Reporting | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.