Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Natalie Comino, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Maravilla, Jose Orozco, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions543 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time608 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: ENDORSED COPY JUDGMENT, DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR CONTESTED JUDGMENT , NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Reason: RTS: NO SUCH NUMBER : UTF |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment (Uniform Parentage-Custody and Support) | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment returned to Clerk's Office for processing | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed and Default Entered | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Received | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children, COMPLETED AND BLANK DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT (FORM FL-105), NOTICE OF ADR OPTIONS, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Under UCCJEA Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.