Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ponce Juan M., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Silverstein Steven D., against Trejo Luis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with S. Paul Bruguera presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by Juan M. Ponce against Luis Trejo. The jurisdiction of the case is a limited civil case, with the amount demanded exceeding $10,000 but not exceeding $25,000. Juan M. Ponce alleges that Luis Trejo i...
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LUIS TREJO .
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Other - STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE; Filed by:
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 30, 2022Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment) - Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)
Date: January 17, 2023Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 16, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.