Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linda Ray, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person Only |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
|
June 21, 2016 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Guardian Person | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document EXAMINER NOTES |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document EXAMINER NOTES |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
|
March 22, 2016 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Guardian Person | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Order: Appointment-Temporary | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Letters: Temporary Guardian | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document CI CONFIDENTIAL Isley 01-07-2016 to 02-29-2016 |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other Confidential Response to Probate Code 1513 Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.