Winters Rita,
filed a(n)
Quiet Title -
Property
case
represented by
Tran & Company Prosperous Law,
against
Sudnicki Chris,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Updated -- Clerk's Notice Of Transmittal-Reclassification: Exact Name: Clerk's Notice Of Transmittal-Reclassification; As To Parties: removed
December 03, 2018
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
December 03, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/31/2018 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2018
Judge: Wendy W. Y. Chang
February 20, 2018
Docket Event
Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77
December 05, 2016
Docket Event
NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED
December 05, 2016
Docket Event
Receipt For Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
November 03, 2016
Docket Event
A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED REASON: COURT ORDER
November 03, 2016
Docket Event
MOTION RULING ISSUED The court's tentative ruling is posted online and in open court for parties to review. The matter is called for hearing. The plaintiff submits to the court's tentative ruling via e-mail. The court adopts its tentative ruling as the final order of the court, as follows: Plaintiff Rita Winters' Motion to Advance Trial Date is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. CCP ¿¿ 128 and 403.040. This is an action for quiet title and cannot be considered a limited jurisdiction case. CCP ¿ 86(b)(1). Accordingly, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil matter and will be given a new case number and be reassigned to a different judge upon payment by Plaintiff of the reclassification fee required under CCP ¿ 403.060. Plaintiff to contact the new department to which the case has been assigned to set a new hearing date for the motion, with no additional filing fee required. Moving party to give notice.
November 03, 2016
Docket Event
TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED
November 03, 2016
Docket Event
MOTION RULING ISSUED The court's tentative ruling is posted online and in open court for parties to review. The matter is called for hearing. The plaintiff submits to the court's tentative ruling via e-mail. The court adopts its tentative ruling as the final order of the court, as follows: Plaintiff Rita Winters' Motion to Advance Trial Date is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. CCP ¿¿ 128 and 403.040. This is an action for quiet title and cannot be considered a limited jurisdiction case. CCP ¿ 86(b)(1). Accordingly, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil matter and will be given a new case number and be reassigned to a different judge upon payment by Plaintiff of the reclassification fee required under CCP ¿ 403.060. Plaintiff to contact the new department to which the case has been assigned to set a new hearing date for the motion, with no additional filing fee required. Moving party to give notice.