Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Earl Robert, Law Offices Of Jasminder Gill Pc, Mcpoland Mauria, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gill Jasminder S, Law Offices Of Jasminder Gill Pc Doing Business As Pacific Coast Injury Law Center, Nguyen Hoan, against Algos Inc, Apc Thomas J Phillip Md, Beverly Hills Pain Institute And, Coast Pain Management Inc, Do Marc E Lynch, (total of 26) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions673 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 05, 2017(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: May 24, 2017(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 15, 2017Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 14, 2017Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 24, 2020Motion re: (name extension)
Date: June 15, 2017Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: July 16, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal)
Date: August 07, 2018Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Discharge Plaintiff Law Offices o...)
Date: November 06, 2019Joinder to Motion - Joinder to Motion Notice of Joinder
Date: July 30, 2020Motion for Leave to Intervene - Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: June 22, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)
Date: July 19, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene;)
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by Proposed Pl...)
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Clerk to Rele...)
Date: December 15, 2022Complaint - Declaratory Relief
Date: December 16, 2015Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: February 04, 2016(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 31, 2017Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Naming DOE 3
Date: October 20, 2017Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Naming DOE 4
Date: October 20, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Service of Summons and Complaint/Dism...)
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Service of Summons and Complaint/Dism...)
Date: February 28, 2020Complaint in Intervention - Complaint in Intervention
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00; Default not entered as to ALGOS INC; On the Complaint filed by EARL, ROBERT on 12/16/2015
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ROBERT EARL (Plaintiff); As to: ALGOS INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00; Default not entered as to ALGOS INC; On the Complaint filed by EARL, ROBERT on 12/16/2015
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00; Default not entered as to ALGOS INC; On the Complaint filed by EARL, ROBERT on 12/16/2015
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Default entered as to ALGOS, INC. On the Complaint filed by EARL, ROBERT on 12/16/2015
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF JASMINDER GILL PC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ROBERT EARL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MAURIA MCPOLAND (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Joinder to Motion Notice of Joinder; Filed by: ROBERT EARL (Plaintiff); MAURIA MCPOLAND (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by Proposed Pl...)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene;) of 07/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene) of 07/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.