Allstate Indemnity Company,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Pillemer & Pillemer,
against
Neri Erick Mauricio,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Allstate Indemnity Company v. Neri Erick Mauricio
Case Events for
Allstate Indemnity Company v. Neri Erick Mauricio
Date
Type
Description
April 09, 2018
Docket Event
Stipulation and Order FOR PAYMENTS OF JUSGMENT BY INSTALLMENTS; Signed and Filed by: ERICK MAURICIO NERI (Defendant); As to: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
February 24, 2017
Docket Event
UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV-DL30 ISSUED
February 24, 2017
Docket Event
DL-30 ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB; DL-30 ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB;
October 07, 2016
Docket Event
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT
October 07, 2016
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTORNEY SERVICE. CM ABSTRACT ISSUED. ATTORNEY SERVICE. CM
September 21, 2016
Docket Event
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED
September 13, 2016
Docket Event
HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR
September 13, 2016
Docket Event
DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT
September 09, 2016
Docket Event
DECLARATIONS FILED. DECLARATIONS FILED. EXHIBITS FILED. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. DOES DISMISSAL FILED.