Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Mario, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc, represented by Garcia Mario, Wilson Turner Kosmo Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by:
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Civil Deposit; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Attorney; As to: MARIO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of ruling at hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to continue Trial; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 14, 2016Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 17, 2018(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION ETC
Date: August 11, 2016(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 03, 2015(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED
Date: September 15, 2016(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE ATTORNEYS MOTION FILED.
Date: October 11, 2016Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 09, 2016(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: January 19, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 20, 2017(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.
Date: April 17, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 29, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 02, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - notice of ruling at hearing
Date: March 01, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 22, 2018Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: August 25, 2016Motion re: (name extension)
Date: August 25, 2016Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 28, 2016Motion re: (name extension)
Date: October 14, 2016Motion re: (name extension)
Date: November 09, 2016Motion re: (name extension)
Date: December 12, 2016Motion re: (name extension)
Date: March 20, 2017Motion re: (name extension)
Date: March 29, 2017Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other Other)
Date: October 12, 2017Motion for Order (name extension) - to Compel
Date: December 19, 2017Motion to Compel (name extension)
Date: January 17, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel)
Date: January 24, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Order Terminating Sanctions;)
Date: March 29, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel; Hearing on Motion for Or...)
Date: April 09, 2018Complaint - Breach of Contract
Date: June 04, 2015Summons
Date: June 04, 2015Other - (name extension)
Date: September 15, 2016Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2016Other - (name extension)
Date: October 14, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 14, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 14, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 09, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2016Other - (name extension)
Date: November 09, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: January 19, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: January 19, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 20, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 26, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: March 20, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: March 29, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 29, 2017Order (name extension)
Date: March 29, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: April 17, 2017Declaration (name extension)
Date: November 02, 2017Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of 11/02/2017
Date: November 02, 2017Ex Parte Application (name extension) - to continue Trial
Date: November 02, 2017Minute Order - (Ex-Parte Proceeding)
Date: November 02, 2017Order (name extension)
Date: November 02, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 02, 2017Notice of Ruling - at Ex Parte Hearing
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 19, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: March 02, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 02, 2018Opposition (name extension)
Date: March 22, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: April 02, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 04, 2015Response (name extension) - ANSWER
Date: August 28, 2015Other - (name extension)
Date: August 11, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: April 12, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by:
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Civil Deposit; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Attorney; As to: MARIO GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling at Ex Parte Hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of 11/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to continue Trial; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Notice of ruling at hearing; Filed by: HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY INC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.