Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSeymour, Shelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDcss Family Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Notice: Entry of Judgment
Date: May 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment-DCSS | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Department Child Support Services Support Calculations | |
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.