Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Seymour, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1589 days |
Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 06, 2017Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: November 17, 2017Request for Order
Date: September 20, 2017Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: October 25, 2017Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: March 25, 2020Request: Cont Court Hrg/Reissue TRO
Date: January 08, 2016Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Date: April 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order Judge: Seymour, Shelly |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Hearing | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Unsuccessful Service: Law Enforcement Agency | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Court Hearing
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Shaver, Donald |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.