Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gudrun Carstairs, Robert Carstairs, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Graystone Capital, Kevin O'Hare, Scott Valley Bank, represented by Stephen J. Kottmeier, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time688 days |
Minute Order
Date: July 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2016Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 03, 2016Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2016Conference: Case Management
Date: June 06, 2017Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: June 06, 2017Conference: Settlement
Date: November 08, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: July 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to temp judge Phil Young |
|
November 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Settlement Conference | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Settlement Conference | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 9 |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Motion for Summary adjudication is Denied |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.