Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Arturo Garcia-Gallegos, Insurance Company Of The West, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Jeffrey Eugene Lowe, Louis S. Abronson, against John Assante, Phoenix Cleaning Company, The Pristine Group, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions493 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time666 days |
Minute Order
Date: July 27, 2017OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: May 11, 2017Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment
Date: July 20, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: August 15, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2016Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2016Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2017Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Complaint With Prej - Atty Jeffrey Lowe |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Complaint Without Prej on lead case (Atty Louis Abronson) |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
July 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment
Judge: Department 9 |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Old: Linsao, New: Lowe |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail substitution of attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.