Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
John, Aga, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Yebri, Sam S, against Ahmadzdeh, Xxxxxx, Aj Limousine Service Llc, Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxx, represented by Wietstock, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Herman, James E presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryUnlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (07) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions328 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time334 days |
Judgment, Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Complaint, Filed
Date: December 15, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: December 15, 2015Summons Issued, Filed
Date: December 15, 2015Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 18, 2016Affidavit, Filed
Date: February 18, 2016Proof of Service, Filed
Date: February 18, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: April 20, 2016Declaration, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Statement, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Deposition, Lodged
Date: August 19, 2016Notice, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Deposition, Lodged
Date: August 19, 2016Declaration, Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Declaration, Filed
Date: October 05, 2016Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: October 20, 2016Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: November 14, 2016Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed
Date: November 14, 2016Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 20, 2016Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed
Date: August 30, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed
Date: November 14, 2016Case Management Order, Filed
Date: April 20, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Opposition, Filed
Date: October 05, 2016Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 19, 2016Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed
Date: September 14, 2016Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Application, Filed
Date: September 16, 2016CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: September 07, 2016Motion, Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Reply, Filed
Date: October 12, 2016Objection, Filed
Date: October 12, 2016Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 12, 2016Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: March 16, 2016Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed
Date: December 16, 2015Order, Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order or Ruling, Filed | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order, Filed Sealing Record Judge: Herman, James E |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed
Judge: Herman, James E |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling, Filed Notice of Ruling Denying Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.