Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rezzato, Matthias, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Flores, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Almquist, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims: 5,001 - 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Referral to Mediation (Small Claims) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff's Claim | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.