Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patel, Ashwin, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kemp, Darlene R, against Miller, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management163 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Short Cause
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Brief Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.