Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Omar, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Jimenez, Jose, Don Jose Auto Sales, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims: 5,001 - 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of voided filing due to non-payment of filing fees | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff's Claim | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff Claim Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.