Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barocio, Micheal, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Maxey, Buddy, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Proietti, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
Category(43): Civil Petition For Harassment With Violence |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1 days |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing
Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order
Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.