Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
William Newman, David Lee, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Lisa M. Gamoian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
Category47 Small Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Letter from David Newman |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.