Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bobian, Latosha M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bobian, Thomas L, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Zepeda, Francine presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions247 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Mangano minute order. See attached. Dept: 201 Judge: R. Mangano Clerk: Z. De La Fuente Reporter: T. Sanchez Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present Hearing Type: OSC, Notice of Mtn., MOD, CC, CV, Other: Readiness Off calendar, No appearance by either party, No proof of service |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Modification OSC/Motion CC, CV Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Modification OSC/Motion - Re: Custody/Visitation | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FL Calendar desk for processing (with file) |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for Ex Parte review with file |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Self Help FL | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Filed for Ex parte Orders |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Copies of 2/9/16 In-Court Judgment of Dissolution sent via mail to each party. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.