Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dimenco, Charlene M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dimenco, Rick A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Zepeda, Francine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Pro Per/Judgment Box in Self-Help Center. re: conformed copies of Default Judgment. Conformed copies of Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to petitioner and respondent in SASE's provided. |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default as to Respondent, Rick DiMenco entered on 6/23/16. |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Conformed copies mailed to parties in SASE |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Self-Help O/A for processing signed In Court Judgment. WITH file. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary & final |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: M. Nguyen/T Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Present/Sworn Pro Per Respondent: Present Pro Per Next family centered case resolution conference is set for: 10/19/16 at 8:30 am in D202 Other: The Court received a completed Preliminary and Final Declaration of Disclosure from Petitioner. This is a long term marriage. The parties have reached an agreement. Parties agree they would not pay or receive spousal support and spousal support is set at $0.00. Court's jurisdiction on Spousal Support is terminated. The 2011 Nissan vehicle with associated debts is awarded to Petitioner. The 1997 Ford vehicle with no debt is awarded to Respondent. The current order for child support will remain. Parties stipulate to joint legal custody of the minor children Nikolas A DiMenco and Paige J DiMenco. Sole physcial custody to Petitioner. Respondent shall have unsupervised visitation as discussed by the parties. In an event of disagreement, parties may file a Request for Order with the Court. JUDGMENT: Court finds: This is an uncontested dissolution of marriage. The Court makes the following findings: Irreconcilable differences have arisen causing a complete and irremediable breakdown of the marriage such that no period of counseling or waiting would help restore the marital relationship. Parties waive rights to notice of trial, written statement of decision, right to move for a new trial and right to appeal. Judgment granted. Court acquired jurisdiction on 07/16/15 by proof of service. Judgment effective upon date of filing. Petitioner is to prepare and submit the judgment for filing. She may seek assistance at the Self-Help Center. If judgment is entered prior to the continued hearing date, the hearing may be taken off calendar. |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.