Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Samuel, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rodriguez, Carlos A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Meehan, Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Reissued
Judge: Meehan, Kathleen A |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judge Meehan Minute Order. See attached. Judge: K. Meehan Clerk: J. Ramirez Reporter: Wendy Saffery Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present Hearing Type: Order to show, TRO reissued Off calendar No appearance by either party No proof of service |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge McGuire Minute Order. See attached. | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 7/16/2015 Reissued Hearing to: 8/7/2015 |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Application and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence OSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.