Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ly, Kathy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ly, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with D. Tyler Tharpe presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions93 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Copies of Judgment of Dissolution sent via mail to each party. |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep Dissolution |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Default and Judgment w/MSA sent to SHC. Received by PKV. As of today, no Response filed. |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: M. Nguyen/T Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference. Next family centered case resolution conference is set for: 12/7/16 at 10:30am in D202 |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX for judgment |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Judgment sent to FLEX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.