Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Iraheta, Maria Del Carmen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Iraheta, Jose Lucio, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time287 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary and Final |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminay and Final |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 3/16/2016 Time: 11:00 Dept: 202 Judge: D. Tharpe Clerk: M. Vang Reporter: NR Petitioner: Present Counsel: Pro Per Respondent: Present Counsel: Pro Per Hearing Type: Other: Dismissal Hearing Continued to: 7/12/2016 Time: 11:00 Dept: 202 Issues: Dismissal Hearing Other: Good cause has been shown why the case should not be dismissed at this time. The matter is hereby continued for another OSC re dismissal hearing on 7/12/2016. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.