Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rosas, Karina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gouge, Curtis Lee, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: M Nguyen Reporter: N Duarte Nature of Hearing: Order to Show Cause, TRO DV Petitioner: Present/Sworn/Pro Per Respondent: Not Present Other: Court is satisfied that Mr. Gouge was served with process for today's date. Court will proceed in his absence. Court reviews the moving papers. Court is satisfy that a domestic violence restraining order will issue. Restraining order is granted for 5 years. No additional person will be listed as protected party. Ms. Rosas should contact law enforcement to peacefully gain access to the storage unit to obtain her personal effects. The person restrained is: Curtis L. Gouge, Respondent. Sex: Male, Ht: 6'2 Wt: 220 Hair Color: Bald Eye color: Brown, Race: White, Age: 29, Birth Date: 06/09/1985 The person protected is: Karina Rosas Personal Conduct Orders: The person restrained must not do the following things to the protected people listed in this paperwork: (a) Harass, attack, strike, threaten, assault (sexually or otherwise), hit follow, stalk, molest, destroy personal property, disturb the peace, keep under surveillance, or block movements (b) Contact (either directly or indirectly), telephone, or send messages, or mail or e-mail. (c) Take any action, direclty or through others, to get the addresses or locations of any protected persons or of their family members, caretakers, or guardians. Peaceful written contact through a lawyer or through a process server or another person in order to serve legal papers is allowed and does not violate this order. Stay Away Order: (a) The person restrained must stay at least: 100 yards away from the protected person and: (1) Home, Vehicle, School of protected person (2) The job or workplace of protected person No Guns or Other Firearms or Ammunition: The person restrained cannot own, possess, have or buy or try to buy, reeive or try to receive, or in any other wage get: a. Gun, other firearms, or ammunition. b. The person restrained must: Sell to a licensed gun dealer or turn in to a law enforcement agency any guns or other firearems within his or her immediate possession or control. This must be done within 24 hours of being served with this order. File a receipt with the court within 48 hours of receiving this order that proves guns have been turned in or sold. (Form DV-800, Proof of Firearms Turned in or Sold may be used for the receipt.) Record Unlawful Communications: The person protected has the right to record communications made by the person restrained that violate the judge's orders. Other Orders: Other orders relating to property control, debt payment, attorney fees, restitution, and/or other issues are in attached Form DV-170 or: See page one Expires on 06/29/20 at 11:59pm vr 08/07/15 |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Minute Order and Restraining Order After Hearing on 6/29/15 was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 6/29/15. Parties served: Curtis Gouge ( ) |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (TEMP) Expiration Date: 6/29/20 at 11:59 p.m. RESTRAINED PERSON: CURTIS GOUGE; DOB: 6/9/85 |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence OSC | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Application and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.