Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Francine Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cordero, Jose, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept.: 202 Clerk: E Flores Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Family Centered Case Status Minute Order Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present No appearance.. Good cause has not been shown as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute (CRC Rule 5.83(c)(4).) Accordingly, the case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 1/19/2016 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Clerk: E Flores/M. Vang Bailiff: R. Harley Petitioner not present Respondent not present Continued to: You are hereby ordered to appear in Department 202 on 3/15/2016, at 11:00 a.m., to show cause why the above-referenced case should not be dismissed. Other: California law requires that Family Law matters proceed in an effective and timely manner from initial filing to final disposition. (Fam. Code 2450, subd. (a), and Standards of Judicial Administration, standard 5.30.) In deciding whether a case is progressing in an effective and timely manner, the Court considers procedural milestones, including the following: (A) A proof of service of summons and petition should be filed within 60 days of case initiation; (B) If no response has been filed, and the parties have not agreed on an extension of time to respond, a request to enter default should be submitted within 60 days after the date the response was due; (C) The petitioner's preliminary declaration of disclosure should be served within 60 days of the filing of the petition; (D) When a default has been entered, a judgment should be submitted within 60 days of the entry of default; (E) Whether a trial date has been requested or scheduled; and (F) When the parties have notified the court that they are actively negotiating or mediating their case, a written agreement for judgment is submitted within six months of the date the petition was filed, or a request for trial date is submitted. (Cal. Rule of Court, rule 5.83(c)(4).) The Court has reason to believe that the above-referenced case is not progressing in an effective and timely manner. |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to filing party in SASE (conformed copies of Granted default with no judgment attached) |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default As to Jose Cordero Jr. |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Default sent to Default Shelf |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.