Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Commercial Trade, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Buryakov, Anatoliy, Buryakov, Raisa, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Dale L. Ikeda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Over $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Ex parte application and order to set aside judgment |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment set aside Default and Default judgment entered against Defendants Anatoliy Buryakov and Raisa Buryakov shall be set aside and Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the signing of this order to file a Answer **conformed copy mailed in SASE** Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 401 Order for: Ex-parte application |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County: Sacramento Amount: $16728.61 |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 109.11 |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Default Received With Judgment Box #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.