Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding, Llc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Fine, David C., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCabrera, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2015 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Denied
Date: January 26, 2016Summons issued and filed
Date: July 28, 2015Civil case cover sheet
Date: July 21, 2015Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Request to Enter Default Denied
Date: April 20, 2017Proof of Service
Date: August 17, 2015Request to Enter Default
Date: October 09, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 24, 2017Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 21, 2015Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Amount: $5,999.05 |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Forward to: 404 |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Denied Previously Entered |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Default Received With Judgment |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Denied
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Forward to: 404 |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Re: Interest; Cost (CCP 1033); Attorney fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.