Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Herrera, Lorena, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied. |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County: Fresno Amount: $5345.38 |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Amount: $5320.38 |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granted order granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE: Collections Case Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Sent on: 6/27/17 Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept:Clerks office for further processing Judgment for Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Proposed Order which is attached will not be forward to judge to rule on. The Notice will simply be filed into the case. |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.