Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brinker Real Estate, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Martinez, Andrew Nathaniel, Telles, Kristen Diane, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return filed Return of Writ of Execution filed wholly satisfied. |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Costs: $110.00 Credit: $0 Interest: $15.28 |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County: Fresno Amount: $ 2550.28 |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Money Damages
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued Premises Only |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s) Without Prejudice Does: 1 to 10 Only |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.