Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, Tammy Sears, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Grieco, Briahna, Duch, Sopath Jason, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Ikeda, Dale presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2015 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Dismissal
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Dismissal
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Ikeda, Dale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.