Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Commercial Trade, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against 24X7 Pro Service, Inc., Azzam, Jennifer L., Azzam, Victor G., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management4 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time92 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed
Date: April 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Summons issued and filed |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Civil case cover sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.