Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sorrent, Frank, Sorrenti, Georgia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nunes, Frank M., against Jfs Enterprises, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time306 days |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: August 31, 2016Conditional Settlement Reached
Date: April 05, 2016Application and Order filed
Date: February 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review request for dismissal-entire action |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference per order signed on 2/17/16 by Judge Hamilton CMC continued |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date: 7/5/16 |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of continuance of CMC |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application and Order filed Application and Order to Continue or Vacate Case Management Conference Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.