Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Clovis, A Municipal Corporation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Cross, Scott G., against First American Title Company, A California Corp, Fresno Irrigation District, Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District, Gorini, Charles P, Guynes, Gerald A, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2015 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Conditional Settlement Reached
Date: February 05, 2016Order filed
Date: February 08, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 12, 2016Notice of Motion
Date: October 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Scott Cross Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice ofErrata to Ex Parte Application for Order for Withdrawal of Deposit; corrected memorandum of Points and Auhorities in Support of Appliaiton and Corrected Declaration of Scott G Cross in Support of Ex Parte Application |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order filed for withdrawal and disbursement of deposit Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 402 Order for: Fow withdrawal and disbursement of deposit, signed and issued. Ff to clerks office 02/09/2016, for further processing. |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Ex parte Filed Application for order for withdrawal of deposit |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date: June 1, 2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.