Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blanda, Jon O, against Woodard, Brian D, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
Category09 Unlimited - Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time488 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 02, 2017Judgment Received
Date: April 03, 2017Order Denied
Date: September 06, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 01, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 30, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 07, 2016Order Denied
Date: February 16, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 01, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 30, 2015Request for Court Judgment
Date: October 19, 2015Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
2223184_107Acknowled Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Amount: $28,522.11 |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received forwarded to RA on 4/12/17 |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Qualified Witness Pursuant CCP Section 585(d) |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Wells Fargo Bank N.A, Qualified Witness re: Non-Military Status. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Clerk's Judgment Request for Court Judgment Forwarded to 4th Floor Clerk's office for further processing. |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Request for Default Received Without judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.