Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jury Commissioner, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Johnson, Debi Jo, Johnson, Stephen Christo H, Kelley, Maudis Marie, Kong, Sarany, Lara, Gerardo Jerry, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Jonathan B. Conklin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time8 days |
Juror Order to Show Cause filed
Date: June 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC Resolved Prior to Hear - New Date for Jury Service Sheriff service recovery fee paid. Action dismissed |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC Resolved Prior to Hear - New Date for Jury Service Sheriff service recovery fee paid. Action dismissed |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Contempt
Judge: Conklin, Jonathan |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Juror OSC | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Attempted Service of Juror OSC | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Proof of Service of Juror OSC |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Proof of Service of Juror OSC |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Juror OSC resolved - excused Juror OSC resolved prior to hearing; Sheriff service recovery fee paid - juror excused/disqualified. Action is dismissed. |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service of Affidavit and OSC re: Juror Contempt Service not complete; juror moved. Hearing off calendar. Action dismissed |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Juror Order to Show Cause filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.