Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The State Of California Dept Of Transportation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Ohanian, Sevana Z, against Sfpp, L.P., Union Pacific Railroad Company, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2015 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time264 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 14, 2017Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 25, 2015Stipulation and Order filed
Date: November 30, 2015Notice of Motion
Date: August 25, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 19, 2017Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 27, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 15, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 14, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 14, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 09, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 05, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 18, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 19, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 16, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 24, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 14, 2016Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 22, 2015Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review Request for Dismissal - Entire Action |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Dalesandro, Samuel |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Pre
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.